MD HB245 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 81
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a holder of a specified alcoholic beverages license in Frederick County who has been granted a Sunday opening permit to sell specified alcoholic beverages for on-premises consumption at a specified event that the Frederick County Board of License Commissioners has approved; providing that the Board set the hours for the event; and making the Act an emergency measure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Sunday Permit - Hours of Sale

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 81
2015-04-07HouseReturned Passed
2015-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2015-04-06SenateSecond Reading Passed
2015-04-06SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2015-04-06SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-06SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-05HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2015-03-03HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-03HouseFavorable with Amendments {903097/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-02HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2015-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-02-02HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0245?ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0245f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0245t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_81_hb0245t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0005/hb0245_90309701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0005/hb0245.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0245_ecm.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0245_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,h-0159&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0245,s-0774&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback