MD HB243 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring a distribution from a perpetual care trust fund made under certain circumstances to be used only for the perpetual care of the cemetery, including the maintenance of the grounds, roads, and paths and the repair and renewal of buildings; permitting a cemetery to select a certain method of distribution; requiring a cemetery to submit to the Director of the Office of Cemetery Oversight a statement attesting that the cemetery's method of distribution will not result in insufficient protection of the trust fund's principal; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-20HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2020-02-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {846386/1 Adopted
2020-02-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-01-21HouseHearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Same As/Similar To

SB483 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-07 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business Regulation5603(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback