MD HB241 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-15)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-20 - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making the crime of human trafficking in a case in which the victim of the crime is an adult a felony, rather than a misdemeanor; and making a conforming change.
Title
Criminal Law - Human Trafficking - Adult Victim - Penalty
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-20 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Human Rights
Penalties and Sentences
Prostitution
Victims