MD HB240 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing that a certain forensic genetic genealogical DNA analysis and search may not be initiated without certifying certain information before a court and obtaining a certain authorization from the court; requiring a court to authorize the initiation of a certain forensic genetic genealogical DNA analysis and search if certain information is certified before the court; prohibiting certain biological samples subjected to certain forensic genetic genealogical profile analysis to be used to determine certain information about a certain donor; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Forensic Genetic Genealogical DNA Analysis, Searching, Regulation, and Oversight

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-30HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 681
2021-04-12HousePassed Enrolled
2021-04-12HouseThird Reading Passed (136-1)
2021-04-12HouseHouse Concurs Senate Amendments
2021-04-12SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2021-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {738672/1 Adopted
2021-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-22SenateReferred Judicial Proceedings
2021-03-20HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2021-03-19HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments {812617/1 Adopted
2021-03-19HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-01-31HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB187 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure17101(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure17102(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure17103(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure17104(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure17105(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0240?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0240f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0240t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0240e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_681_hb0240e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0240_81261701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0000/hb0240_73867201.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0240_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/hb0240_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0663.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/1482.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/1169.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback