MD HB238 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1335

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-12 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring, beginning October 1, 2021, the expungement of certain records 3 years after a disposition of the charge under certain circumstances; requiring a court to send a notice of the disposition of certain charges in a case and the date on which expungement is required to the person entitled to the expungement and certain entities; requiring a court to notify a defendant of the defendant's right to expungement under certain circumstances; requiring the court to notify the defendant by mail; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-12SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2021-04-10SenateReferred Rules
2021-04-10HouseThird Reading Passed (97-36)
2021-04-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {522011/1 Adopted
2021-04-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2021-01-31HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Judiciary
2020-10-30HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1335 (Carry Over) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Criminal Procedure10105(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure10105.1(n/a)See Bill Text
Criminal Procedure10105.2(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback