MD HB238 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of County Commissioners of Allegany County, rather than the Governor, to fill a vacancy in an elected member's position on the Allegany County Board of Education for the remainder of that term and until a successor is elected and qualifies.
Title
Allegany County Board of Education - Elected Members - Filling a Vacancy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
SB240 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Subjects
Allegany County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Officials