MD HB237 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of the Maryland Veterans Commission by adding a representative of the Reserve Organization of America.
Title
State Government – Maryland Veterans Commission – Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-25 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2022-02-22 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-21 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 3:00 p.m. |
2022-01-25 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-13 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB365 (Crossfiled) 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 69
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Public Officials
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Veterans
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 915 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 916 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 917 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |