MD HB237 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-27 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting community college trustees and employees from engaging in any unfair labor practice; and providing that the Act does not apply to certain activities or expenses incurred under certain circumstances.
Title
Community Colleges - Unfair Labor Practices - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-47) (Y: 84 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {343828/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-87) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2018-02-21 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment {343828/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-87) (Y: 48 N: 88 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2018-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (83-47) |
2018-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-21 | House | Floor Amendment {343828/1 (Delegate Adams) Rejected (47-87) |
2018-02-20 | House | Special Order until 2/21 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2018-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Appropriations |