MD HB235 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 20-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Assessments and Taxation to maintain a database, available to the public on the Department's Web site, that relates to the valuation of specified real property in the State and includes specified information.
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Residential Real Property - Database
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 361 |
2013-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-03-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {525569/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Electronic Government
Public Information
Real Property
Records
Taxes - Property
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Electronic Government
Public Information
Real Property
Records
Taxes - Property