MD HB235 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings (Senator DeGrange) (27-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-06 - Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings (Senator DeGrange) (27-20)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting discrimination based on gender identity with regard to housing and employment and by specified licensed or regulated persons; altering an exception for employers relating to standards concerning dress and grooming; providing specified immunity; requiring State personnel actions to be made without regard to gender identity or sexual orientation; defining the term "gender identity"; etc.
Title
Human Relations - Sexual Orientation and Gender Identity - Antidiscrimination
Sponsors
Del. Tiffany Alston [D] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Del. Kumar Barve [D] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] | Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-06 - Senate - Motion Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings (DeGrange) Adopted (Y: 27 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 86 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-06 | Recommit to Committee Judicial Proceedings (Senator DeGrange) (27-20) | |
2011-04-06 | Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2011-04-11 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-04-06 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-04-06 | Re-referred Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (86-52) | |
2011-03-25 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Ross) Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-23 | Hearing 3/9 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Discrimination
Employment Agencies
Financial Institutions
Housing
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Real Estate
Sexual Orientation
State Employees
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Employment Agencies
Financial Institutions
Housing
Leases and Rent
Liability
Licenses
Real Estate
Sexual Orientation
State Employees
Unions
Work, Labor and Employment