MD HB233 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a health care provider to disclose a medical record without specified authorization to a guardian ad litem appointed by a court to protect specified interests of a minor or a disabled or elderly individual who is a specified victim, for a specified purpose and use in specified court proceedings; authorizing a specified guardian ad litem to redisclose a specified record under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Disclosure of Medical Records - Guardian Ad Litem - Victims of Crime or Delinquent Acts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 166 |
2017-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2017-03-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Safety
Victims
Vulnerable Adults
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Developmental Disabilities
Disabilities
Disclosure
Elderly Persons
Fees
Health
Health Occupations
Mental and Behavioral Health
Minors
Parents and Guardians
Public Health
Records
Safety
Victims
Vulnerable Adults