MD HB233 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Excluding specified cargo loading devices from the calculation of the length of a motor vehicle or combination of vehicles for the purposes of compliance with maximum motor vehicle or combination of vehicles length requirements; clarifying that specified factors included in the calculation of the length of a motor vehicle apply to the calculation of the length of a combination of vehicles; extending the application of the calculation to specified provisions of law; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2015-03-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-02 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicles
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures
Motor Vehicles
Trucks
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Weights and Measures