MD HB232 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 18 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the deadlines for the interim and final reporting requirements for the Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council; altering the membership of the Council by adding one representative of an electric vehicle driver advocacy organization instead of the Baltimore Electric Vehicle Initiative, two, instead of one, representative of the environmental community, and one from a new vehicle dealer association in the State; and extending until June 30, 2026, the termination date for the Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Zero Emission Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting, Membership, and Sunset Extension

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-17SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-13SenateHearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-28SenateReferred Finance
2020-02-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2020-02-25HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments {840910/1 Adopted
2020-02-24HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2020-01-17HouseHearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-17HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Chapter of the Acts2011(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2013(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2015(n/a)See Bill Text
Chapter of the Acts2019(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback