MD HB230 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the circumstances under which the State may withdraw from the Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative by requiring the General Assembly to enact a law approving the withdrawal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative - Withdrawal - Legislative Approval Required (Regional Greenhouse Gas Initiative Extension Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (41-5) (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (87-48) (Y: 88 N: 49 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 768
2018-04-02HouseReturned Passed
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed (41-5)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-02-09HouseThird Reading Passed (87-48)
2018-02-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-02-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-02-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-01HouseHearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback