MD HB23 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Declaring a certain State policy concerning rental residential buildings; prohibiting the owner of a rental residential building that receives financial assistance from the Department of Housing and Community Development from entering into or renewing an exclusive access agreement with an Internet provider or a television provider under certain circumstances; defining "rental residential building" and "television provider"; and applying the Act prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing and Community Development – Rental Residential Buildings – Prohibition on Exclusive Access Agreements

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-18HouseUnfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-17HouseHearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation
2018-08-01HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback