MD HB23 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-01 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Baltimore County Superintendent of Schools to conduct active assailant event training for school personnel in Baltimore County each school year; requiring the Baltimore County Superintendent to require certain public schools to hold an active assailant event drill three times each school year; requiring certain training and drills to comply with guidelines established by the United States Department of Homeland Security or be consistent with available best practices; etc.
Title
Baltimore County - Public Schools - Active Assailant Event Training and Drills
Sponsors
Del. Bob Long [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-01-25 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2017-07-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Baltimore County
Crimes and Punishments
Education - Local Bills
Emergencies
Federal Government
Guns
Job Training
Public Schools
Safety
Teachers
Threats
Violence
Crimes and Punishments
Education - Local Bills
Emergencies
Federal Government
Guns
Job Training
Public Schools
Safety
Teachers
Threats
Violence