MD HB229 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from importing, selling, or offering for sale specified child care products containing specified flame-retardant chemicals; authorizing the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to suspend implementation of specified provisions of the Act if the Secretary makes a specified determination; requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to adopt specified regulations on or before January 1, 2015; etc.
Title
Public Health - Child Care Products Containing Flame-Retardant Chemicals - TDCPP - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-0) (Y: 129 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 391 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-0) |
2014-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-02-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {576881/1 Report Adopted |
2014-02-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Child Care
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Toys
Commerce and Business
Consumer Protection
Crimes and Punishments
Equipment
Fire Protection
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Minors
Public Health
Rules and Regulations
Toys