MD HB228 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the date by which the Park System Critical Maintenance Fund must be expended to before July 1, 2029; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to expend up to $400,000 from the Park System Critical Maintenance Fund under certain circumstances; authorizing the Park System Capital Improvements and Acquisition Fund to be used for State projects on lands managed by the Department for public purposes; authorizing the Great Maryland Outdoors Fund to be used for promoting outdoor environmental education in the State; etc.
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland State Parks - Funds and Plan Alterations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 402 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-11) |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {443028/1 Adopted |
2024-03-29 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793025/1 Adopted |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation and Appropriations |
2023-09-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB259 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Subjects
Advertising
Appropriations
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Education
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
meetings
Minorities
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Parking
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Wetlands
Appropriations
Awareness and Outreach
Bicycles
Committees and Commissions
Conservation
Education
Environmental Justice
Environmental Matters
Forests and Parks
General Services, Department of
Governor
Grants
meetings
Minorities
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Parking
Prices
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Transportation
Wetlands
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Natural Resources | 5 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 221 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 222 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 2A-03 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 5 | 2A-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |