MD HB227 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a prohibition on an applicant or applicant's agent making a payment to the County Executive of Prince George's County or a slate that includes the County Executive during the pendency of certain applications.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prince George’s County – Ethics – Limitations on Applicant Campaign Contributions PG 404–19

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-28) (Y: 109 N: 29 NV: 4 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (108-28)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback