MD HB227 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "legal interest" to include an interest in a dwelling as a settlor, grantor, or beneficiary of a trust under specified circumstances so as to include specified settlors, grantors, or beneficiaries of trusts as eligible to apply for the homestead property tax credit.
Title
Homestead Tax Credit - Eligibility - Definition of Legal Interest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 527 |
2014-03-24 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:45 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {245763/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-01-17 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |