MD HB225 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-08 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a Deferred Retirement Option Program for members in the Correctional Officers' Retirement System who have at least 20 years and less than 25 years of eligibility service; requiring the State Retirement Agency to request, on or before July 1, 2017, specified documentation from the Internal Revenue Service; and making the Act subject to a specified contingency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Deferred Retirement Option Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-08HouseUnfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
2017-02-07HouseHearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2017-01-20HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback