MD HB222 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an escrow agent to enter into a written agreement with the purchaser and the seller of certain residential real property when the escrow agent agrees to hold trust money in escrow for the residential real estate transaction; requiring a written agreement an escrow agent enters into with the purchaser and the seller to contain certain information; and applying the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Real Property - Residential Real Estate Transactions - Escrow Agents

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-01SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-28HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {620112/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-01-29HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback