MD HB222 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-2)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-23 - Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from distributing heroin or fentanyl, the use of which is a contributing cause of the death of another; establishing penalties for a violation of the Act of up to 30 years in prison; providing that it is not a defense that the defendant did not directly distribute the heroin or fentanyl to the decedent; establishing a specified immunity; etc.
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-23 | House | Recommitted to Judiciary (Delegate Dumais) |
2015-03-19 | House | Special Order until 3/20 (Delegate M. Washington) Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Dumais) {863025/1 Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {172711/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Good Samaritan
Penalties and Sentences
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Dealers
Death
Emergency Medical Services
Good Samaritan
Penalties and Sentences