MD HB220 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-29 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring Baltimore County to issue on request of a secured party a certificate of vacancy or a certificate of property unfit for human habitation for purposes of filing an order to docket or complaint to foreclose on residential property; and requiring that a certificate be issued or denied in Baltimore County within 14 days after the date of the request for the certificate.
Title
Foreclosures - Baltimore County - Certificate of Vacancy or Certificate of Property Unfit for Human Habitation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2017-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments {860410/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-02 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |