MD HB218 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring certain private entities in possession of biometric identifiers or biometric information to develop a written policy, made available to the public, establishing a certain retention schedule and guidelines for permanently destroying biometric identifiers and biometric information; prohibiting a private entity from being required to make publicly available a certain policy; requiring each private entity in possession of biometric identifiers or biometric information to comply with certain schedules and guidelines; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-25HouseWithdrawn by Sponsor
2021-01-14HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2020-09-28HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB16 (Crossfiled) 2020-12-23 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Commercial Law144301(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144302(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144303(n/a)See Bill Text
Commercial Law144304(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback