MD HB217 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a member of the State Retirement and Pension System may not receive creditable service for unused sick leave at retirement unless the leave was available to the member to be used as sick leave during employment; and clarifying the definition of "unused sick leave" to specify that the leave must have been available to be used as sick leave during employment.
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Credit for Unused Sick Leave - Clarification
Sponsors
Del. Ben Barnes [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230 |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 8:30 a.m. |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-02-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-17 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-16 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |