MD HB217 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Director of the Mental Hygiene Administration to transfer individuals from a public mental health facility to the Clifton T. Perkins Hospital Center under specified circumstances; requiring the Director to give specified individuals notice and an opportunity for a hearing before the Office of Administrative Hearings; providing that decisions of administrative law judges made under the Act are final; authorizing the Director to transfer individuals between public mental health facilities; etc.
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Mental Hygiene Administration -
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-28 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-02-25 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Review Boards
State Hospitals
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Hearings
Jurisdiction
Mental Health
Notices
Patients
Review Boards
State Hospitals