MD HB216 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 110
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "campaign material" to include certain material that is an automated or prerecorded oral communication.
Title
Election Law – Campaign Material – Definition
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Sen. Shelly Hettleman [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] |
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 110 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {655867/1 Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Advertising
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Publications
Recordings
Telephones
Communications
Disclosure
Elections
Political Candidates
Political Parties
Publications
Recordings
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Election Law | 13 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |