MD HB216 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-6)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that prohibitions relating to the practice of veterinary medicine do not apply to emergency veterinary care for which a person may not be held civilly liable; providing immunity from civil liability for specified people providing emergency veterinary aid, care, or assistance to an animal where the owner or custodian is not available to grant permission under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Emergency Veterinary Care - Immunity From Liability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-1) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-1) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412 |
2017-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-1) |
2017-04-10 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {198470/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-24 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-1) |
2017-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {110014/1 Report Adopted |
2017-02-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |