MD HB216 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from manufacturing for sale or accepting for sale a personal care product or an over-the-counter drug that contains synthetic plastic microbeads on or after specified dates; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Department to periodically review specified guidelines to ensure that specified methods are being utilized to prevent the entrance of synthetic plastic microbeads into the natural aquatic environment of the State; etc.
Title
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-3) (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-10) (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-10) (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 409 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-3) |
2015-04-13 | House | Conference Committee Report Adopted |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Bates |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Refuses to Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | Delegates Barve, Frush, and O'Donnell |
2015-04-11 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2015-04-11 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2015-04-11 | House | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {134232/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-10) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {940316/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Drugs
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Drugs
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Industry and Technology
Pollution
Rules and Regulations
Sewage