MD HB213 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a provision that provides for the termination of a prohibition on selling alcoholic beverages that are sold in a powder or crystalline form for direct use or use in combination with water or any other substance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic Beverages - Sale of Powdered Alcohol - Prohibition

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-28) (Y: 110 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-7) (Y: 40 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-21) (Y: 100 N: 22 NV: 12 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2018-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2018-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (109-28)
2018-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-03-30SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (39-7)
2018-03-29SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments {974636/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-29SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-12SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed (99-21)
2018-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed
2018-03-07HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2018-03-06HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2018-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0213&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0213f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0213t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0213e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0213_97463601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0213.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0213_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0320.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0213_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/0981.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/1354.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/veto_letters/hb0213.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback