MD HB212 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court as a condition of sentencing to prohibit a defendant convicted of certain crimes relating to cruelty against animals from owning, possessing, or residing with an animal for a specified period of time.
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Sentencing Conditions
Sponsors
Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Vanessa Atterbeary [D] | Del. Glen Glass [R] | Del. Michael Malone [R] |
Del. Neil Parrott [R] | Del. Elizabeth Proctor [D] | Del. Carlos Sanchez [D] | Sen. Charles Sydnor [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {152010/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2018-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Abuse
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Animals
Commerce and Business
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences