MD HB211 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species; requiring the Department to prepare a specified fishery management plan for the cownose ray species by December 31, 2018, subject to available funding; prohibiting a person from sponsoring, conducting, or participating in a cownose ray fishing contest in State waters until July 1, 2019; etc.
Title
Cownose Ray Fishery Management Plan and Moratorium on Contests
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-21) (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (119-21) (Y: 119 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 398 |
2017-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (119-21) |
2017-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {140619/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-20 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Contests
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Crimes and Punishments
Emergency Bills
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations