MD HB211 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting a person from selling, on or after January 1, 2018, a neonicotinoid pesticide unless the person also sells a restricted use pesticide; prohibiting a person from using a neonicotinoid pesticide on or after January 1, 2018, unless the person is a certified applicator or a person working under specified circumstances; requiring the Department of Agriculture to incorporate pollinator habitat expansion and enhancement practices into the State's Managed Pollinator Protection Plan; requiring a specified report; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Neonicotinoid Pesticides - Restrictions on Sales and Use (Pollinator Protection Act of 2016)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (99-38) (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (34-12) (Y: 34 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-38) (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected (44-94) (Y: 44 N: 94 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected (45-94) (Y: 45 N: 94 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-28HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 662
2016-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (99-38)
2016-04-07HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (34-12)
2016-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-05SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Hough) {813323/1 Adopted
2016-04-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {104534/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-21SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (97-38)
2016-03-17HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Ghrist) {523929/1 Rejected (44-94)
2016-03-17HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Hornberger) {603729/2 Rejected (45-94)
2016-03-17HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Hornberger) Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments {570015/2 Report Adopted
2016-03-17HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-02-10HouseHearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-01-22HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0211?ys=2016rs
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0211f.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0211t.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0211e.pdf
Texthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_662_hb0211e.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0211_57001502.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0211_52392901.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0211_60372902.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0211_10453401.pdf
Amendmenthttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0211_81332301.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0211.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0211_env.pdf
Supplementhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0211_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0211,h-0468&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0211,h-0469&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0211,h-0642&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0211,s-1024&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttps://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0211,h-1075&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback