MD HB21 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the holder of a certificate of sale include the e-mail address of certain persons in certain notices required to be sent to certain persons with an interest in a property that is sold at a tax sale; authorizing certain persons with an interest in owner-occupied property sold at a tax sale to request the current payoff amount to redeem the property; providing that the payoff amount to redeem the property provided by the holder of the certificate to the owner of the property is valid for 30 days; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Notices and Payoff Amount for Redemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274 |
2023-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2023-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2023-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-02-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {243024/1 Adopted |
2023-02-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2023-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2022-11-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 14 | 833 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |