MD HB21 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the requirement that the Subcabinet for Children, Youth, and Families appoint a member of the State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals; and repealing the requirement that the Board adopt an official seal.
Title
State Board for the Certification of Residential Child Care Program Professionals - Membership and Official Seal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 702 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-02-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-0) |
2022-02-15 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m. |
2022-01-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2021-10-12 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB133 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 703
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 20 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 20 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |