MD HB21 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain regulations to include a requirement that results from certain testing obtained from a sexual assault evidence collection kit be submitted to the Federal Bureau of Investigation's "Combined DNA Index System" within 6 months after the evidence has been tested.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Sexual Assault Evidence Collection Kit - Reporting to CODIS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary |
2018-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-10 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-10-25 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Evidence
Public Safety
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Criminal Law - Procedure
Data
Evidence
Public Safety
Records
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses