MD HB21 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the court to dismiss a specified claim filed in a circuit court or a United States District Court against a person for injury caused by the ingestion of lead-based paint or lead-contaminated dust if the person does not file a certificate of a qualified expert for each defendant; specifying the contents of the certificate; etc.
Title
Certificate of a Qualified Expert - Lead Paint Poisoning Claims
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-07 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-27 | Hearing 4/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (131-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 250014/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters | |
2011-08-01 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Courts
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Hearings
Housing
Judges
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Notices
Real Property
Registration
Witnesses
Courts
Environmental Matters
Evidence
Fees
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Hearings
Housing
Judges
Judgments
Landlord and Tenant
Notices
Real Property
Registration
Witnesses