MD HB21 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 to change the location of the John Hanson Memorial to the City of Frederick.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Frederick County - The John
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-10 | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations | |
2010-01-19 | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2009-09-14 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0021.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0021f.pdf |