MD HB209 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Continuing the State Board of Public Accountancy in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2024; and requiring the Board to submit a specified report on or before October 1, 2013.
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsors
Del. The Speaker [?] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-02-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-14 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-02-04 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-21 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Accountants
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Licenses
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset
Business Regulation and Occupations
Committees and Commissions
Licenses
Reports
State Government - General Assembly
Sunset