MD HB209 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the purchase of agricultural land preservation easements if the land meets specified requirements and is subject to specified regulations governing the use of the land; clarifying that specified provisions of the Act do not exempt a landowner from complying with specified local laws or State or local requirements; prohibiting land subject to agricultural easement from being used for specified purposes; allowing a landowner to reserve up to three 1-acre lots to construct single-family residential dwellings, etc.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation Easements - Allowable
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | |
2011-03-10 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-10 | Floor Committee Amendment Adopted | |
2011-03-10 | Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted | |
2011-03-08 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Agriculture
Boundaries
Conservation
Construction
Easements
Farmland
Housing
Land Records
Landlord and Tenant
Nuisances
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Signatures
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture
Boundaries
Conservation
Construction
Easements
Farmland
Housing
Land Records
Landlord and Tenant
Nuisances
Prices
Rules and Regulations
Sewage
Signatures
Zoning and Planning