MD HB208 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing specified provisions of law that condition the use of specified trade names by specified chiropractors, massage therapists, and massage practitioners on preapproval of the use by the State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners.
Title
State Board of Chiropractic and Massage Therapy Examiners - Preapproval for Use of Trade Names - Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229 |
2015-04-13 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2015-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-02-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-30 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |