MD HB208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-9)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that the holders of specified alcoholic beverages manufacturing and retail licenses and refillable container permits may refill specified containers that are branded by a specified holder of a refillable container permit; authorizing the issuance of refillable container permits in specified jurisdictions to the holders of specified licenses for specified fees and subject to specified requirements; establishing a refillable container permit in Prince George's County and in St. Mary's County; etc.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Containers - Permits and Labels
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (127-0) (Y: 127 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (127-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {824937/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-04 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments {983095/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-17 | House | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Advertising
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Beverage Containers
Carroll County
Cecil County
Comptroller
Counties
Dorchester County
Fees
Forms
Garrett County
Harford County
Hearings
Howard County
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Wicomico County
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Annapolis
Anne Arundel County
Baltimore City
Baltimore County
Beverage Containers
Carroll County
Cecil County
Comptroller
Counties
Dorchester County
Fees
Forms
Garrett County
Harford County
Hearings
Howard County
Labeling
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Rules and Regulations
St. Mary's County
Wicomico County