MD HB208 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the areas within which the Secretary of Natural Resources may establish aquaculture limits; authorizing the Department of Natural Resources to resurvey specified areas for a specified purpose; requiring the Department to amend natural oyster bar charts or coordinates by regulation under specified circumstances; altering and establishing restrictions for Aquaculture Enterprise Zones and leases; providing that the Department may only issue a shellfish lease to a corporation under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Aquaculture - Shellfish Leasing Areas - Expansion
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Colburn) {613122/1 Rejected (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-01 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Colburn) {613122/1 Rejected (Y: 10 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-21 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-04-01 | Floor Amendment (Senator Colburn) Rejected (10-36) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Special Order until 4/4 (Senator Colburn) Adopted | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-28 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-24 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-21 | Third Reading Passed (135-3) | |
2011-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-02 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-28 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boundaries
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Corporations
Enterprise Zones
Fish and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations
Boundaries
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Corporations
Enterprise Zones
Fish and Fishing
Leases and Rent
Maps and Charts
Natural Resources, Department of
Oysters
Rules and Regulations