MD HB207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-14 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a judicial officer from authorizing the pretrial release of a defendant charged with a crime involving a handgun after having been convicted of a crime involving a handgun within the previous 5 years; and requiring that a certain defendant be held without bail pending trial in a certain correctional facility.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
Sponsors
Del. Dalya Attar [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2022-01-19 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
District Courts
Guns
Judges
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
District Courts
Guns
Judges
Pretrial Detention or Release
Public Safety
Repeat Offenders
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 5 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |