MD HB207 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of a "high performance building" as it applies to specified provisions of law relating to State capital projects; and requiring the Maryland Green Building Council to establish a process for receiving public input.
Title
State Capital Projects - High Performance Buildings - Maryland Green Building Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-0) (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 589 |
2014-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2014-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2014-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {816784/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-01-16 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Appropriations |
Subjects
Building Codes
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
State Government - Regulations and Procedures
Committees and Commissions
Construction
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Public Buildings and Facilities
Public Works
State Government - Regulations and Procedures