MD HB205 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB208

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Hearing: Jan 27 @ 1:30 pm House Ways and Means Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each county board of education to ensure that each public school provide, at no charge to students, menstrual hygiene products via dispensers in the restrooms at the school; requiring a public middle or high school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least two restrooms on or before October 1, 2021, and certain restrooms on or before August 1, 2025; and requiring a public elementary school to install menstrual hygiene product dispensers in at least one restroom by October 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-22HouseHearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2020-09-24HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB208 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB427 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-21 - Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback