MD HB205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB414
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-22 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Transportation promptly to
undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor to include in the annual State budget an appropriation of $12,000,000 from the Transportation Trust Fund in fiscal years 2022 and $15,000,000 in fiscal year 2023 for certain purposes related to the Project; etc.
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation) |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2020-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2020-01-16 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB205 (Carry Over) 2020-01-22 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
SB105 (Crossfiled) 2019-12-19 - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
SB105 (Crossfiled) 2019-12-19 - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Charles County
Environmental Matters
Governor
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Prince George's County
Railroads
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Budget and Management, Department of
Charles County
Environmental Matters
Governor
Mass Transit
Operating Budget
Prince George's County
Railroads
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0205?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/hb/hb0205f.pdf |