MD HB204 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 290
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting certain law enforcement agencies from issuing a citation for a violation recorded by a traffic control signal monitoring system at a traffic control signal that does not comply with certain yellow light timing requirements set in accordance with regulations adopted by the State Highway Administration consistent with standards or guidelines established by the Federal Highway Administration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems – Yellow Signal Compliance

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-24HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 290
2018-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-06SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2018-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2018-04-05SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-14SenateHearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-02SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2018-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2018-02-27HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-02-27HouseFavorable with Amendments {430117/1 Report Adopted
2018-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2018-02-08HouseHearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-01-18HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback