MD HB204 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 14 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring Montgomery County to have 10 early voting centers; and providing the Act shall be applied to and interpreted to require that Montgomery County have 10 early voting centers for the 2016 election cycle and that the tenth early voting center be located at the Potomac Community Recreation Center, if available, or if not, at another facility that serves the Potomac area community.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Montgomery County - Elections - Early Voting Centers MC 14-16

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 7
2016-02-26HouseReturned Passed
2016-02-25SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2016-02-23SenateSecond Reading Passed
2016-02-23SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2016-02-19SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-18SenateHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-05SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-02-04HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2016-02-02HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-02-02HouseFavorable with Amendments {275960/1 Report Adopted
2016-02-01HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2016-01-27HouseHearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m.
2016-01-21HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0204?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0204f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0204t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_7_hb0204t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0204_27596001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0204.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0204_w&m.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0204_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0204,h-0049&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0204,s-0327&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments 750

feedback